Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop János Telegdy

Deceased

Archbishop of Kalocsa

Bishop of Nitra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1575BornNové Zámky
10 Feb 159419.1Ordained PriestPriest of Esztergom, Hungary
27 Jan 161035.0AppointedBishop of Bosnia (Bosna), Croatia
25 Sep 161136.7Ordained BishopBishop of Bosnia (Bosna), Croatia
161338.0AppointedBishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}, Romania
Mar 161944.1AppointedBishop of Nitra, Slovakia
162348.0AppointedArchbishop of Kalocsa, Hungary
162449.0AppointedBishop of Nitra, Slovakia
164772.0DiedArchbishop of Kalocsa, Hungary

MicroData Summary for János Telegdy:
Archbishop János Telegdy , Archbishop of Kalocsa

  • a priest for 52.8 years
  • a bishop for 35.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 119, and Page 156
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 260, and Page 358
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 51, Number 281
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1611, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 26 Mar 2015