Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mihály Endrey-Eipel

Deceased

Bishop of Vác, Hungary


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Nov 1905Born
12 Aug 192822.7Ordained PriestPriest of Esztergom, Hungary
20 Nov 195045.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Eger, Hungary
20 Nov 195045.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Barata
1 Apr 195145.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Barata
8 Feb 197266.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Pécs, Hungary
7 Jan 197569.1AppointedBishop of Vác, Hungary
4 Jul 197771.6DiedBishop of Vác, Hungary

MicroData Summary for Mihály Endrey-Eipel
Bishop Mihály Endrey-Eipel (born , died ) Bishop of Vác

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBudapest
Ordained BishopFranciscan, Church, Budapest

  • a priest for 48.8 years
  • a bishop for 26.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1951, Number 21
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 21, Number 1,135

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast