Catholic-Hierarchy DC

János Keresztély Cardinal Scitovszky

Deceased

Archbishop of Esztergom

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Croce in Gerusalemme


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Nov 1785³BornBelá, Hungary
1 Nov 180924.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Rožňava, Slovakia
5 Nov 180924.0Ordained PriestPriest of Rožňava, Slovakia
19 Aug 182741.8SelectedBishop of Rožňava, Slovakia
28 Jan 182842.2ConfirmedBishop of Rožňava, Slovakia
25 Mar 182842.4Ordained BishopBishop of Rožňava, Slovakia
22 Nov 183853.1SelectedBishop of Pécs, Hungary
18 Feb 183953.3ConfirmedBishop of Pécs, Hungary
21 Jul 184963.7SelectedArchbishop of Esztergom, Hungary
28 Sep 184963.9ConfirmedArchbishop of Esztergom, Hungary
23 Nov 184964.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of Pécs, Hungary
6 Jan 185266.2ResignedApostolic Administrator of Pécs, Hungary
7 Mar 185367.3Elevated to Cardinal
16 Nov 185469.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Croce in Gerusalemme
19 Oct 186681.0DiedArchbishop of Esztergom, Hungary

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for János Keresztély Scitovszky:
Cardinal János Keresztély Scitovszky (born , died ) Archbishop of Esztergom

  • a priest for 57.0 years
  • a bishop for 38.6 years
  • a cardinal for 13.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 528, and Page 48
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 325, and Page 316
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 7 Mar 1853

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013