Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lajos Rajner

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Esztergom, Hungary

Titular Bishop of Cidyessus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Sep 1842Born
25 Jul 186623.8Ordained PriestPriest of Esztergom, Hungary
14 Jun 190663.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Esztergom, Hungary
14 Jun 190663.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Cidyessus
8 Jul 190663.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cidyessus
27 Mar 192077.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Esztergom, Hungary

MicroData Summary for Lajos Rajner
Bishop Lajos Rajner (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Esztergom

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVisk

  • a priest for 53.6 years
  • a bishop for 13.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1920
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1906, Number 41

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast