Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Dénes Cardinal Szécsi

Deceased

Archbishop of Esztergom, Hungary

Cardinal-Priest of San Ciriaco alle Terme Diocleziane


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1400Born
21 Apr 143838.3AppointedBishop of Nitra, Slovakia
5 Jun 143939.4AppointedBishop of Eger, Hungary
18 Dec 143939.9Elevated to Cardinal
8 Jan 144040.0InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Ciriaco alle Terme Diocleziane
15 Feb 144040.1AppointedArchbishop of Esztergom, Hungary
1 Feb 146565.0DiedArchbishop of Esztergom, Hungary

MicroData Summary for Dénes Szécsi
Dénes Cardinal Szécsi (born 1400, died ) Archbishop of Esztergom

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEger

  • a cardinal for 25.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 18 Dec 1439
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 204

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast