Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Szabó

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Esztergom

Titular Bishop of Nilopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Mar 1805BornMezőkomárom
29 Sep 183025.5Ordained DeaconDeacon
30 Sep 183025.5Ordained PriestPriest
22 Jun 186863.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Esztergom, Hungary
22 Jun 186863.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Nilopolis
19 Jul 186863.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nilopolis
27 Apr 188479.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Esztergom, Hungary

MicroData Summary for Joseph Szabó:
Bishop Joseph Szabó (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Esztergom

  • a priest for 53.5 years
  • a bishop for 15.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 415

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 5 Jun 2015