Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop László Szalkai

Deceased

Archbishop of Esztergom, Hungary


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1475¹Born
13 Aug 151540.6AppointedBishop of Vác, Hungary
18 Jun 152348.4AppointedBishop of Eger, Hungary
6 May 152449.3AppointedArchbishop of Esztergom, Hungary
16 Apr 152550.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Esztergom, Hungary
29 Aug 152651.6DiedArchbishop of Esztergom, Hungary

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for László Szalkai
Archbishop László Szalkai (born 1475, died ) Archbishop of Esztergom

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMateszalka
Ordained BishopBuda

  • a bishop for 1.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 325, and Page 98
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 304
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1515, Number 26*
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1525, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 11 Jun 2018

Quantcast