Catholic-Hierarchy DC

József Cardinal Mindszenty

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Esztergom

Cardinal-Priest of Santo Stefano al Monte Celio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Mar 1892BornCsehimindszent
12 Jun 191523.2Ordained PriestPriest of Szombathely, Hungary
3 Mar 194451.9AppointedBishop of Veszprém, Hungary
25 Mar 194452.0Ordained BishopBishop of Veszprém, Hungary
2 Oct 194553.5AppointedArchbishop of Esztergom, Hungary
18 Feb 194653.9Elevated to Cardinal
18 Feb 194653.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santo Stefano al Monte Celio
2 Feb 197481.8RetiredArchbishop of Esztergom, Hungary
6 May 197583.1DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Esztergom, Hungary

MicroData Summary for József Mindszenty:
Cardinal József Mindszenty (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Esztergom

  • a priest for 59.9 years
  • a bishop for 31.1 years
  • a cardinal for 29.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1944, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013