Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Iván Pálos

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Esztergom, Hungary

Titular Bishop of Isola


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Sep 1913Born
21 Jun 193622.8Ordained PriestPriest of Esztergom, Hungary
7 Jan 197561.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Esztergom, Hungary
7 Jan 197561.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Isola
6 Feb 197561.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Isola
28 Mar 198773.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Esztergom, Hungary

MicroData Summary for Iván Pálos
Bishop Iván Pálos (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Esztergom

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKomarom
Ordained BishopSt. Etienne, Budapest, Archdiocese of Esztergom

  • a priest for 50.7 years
  • a bishop for 12.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 27, Number 1,535

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast