Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop József Károly Zbiško

Deceased

Bishop of Knin (Tinin)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Nov 1711³BornBakabánya, Slovakia
1734¹22.1Ordained PriestPriest of Esztergom, Hungary
11 Aug 175543.7SelectedBishop of Knin (Tinin), Croatia
15 Dec 175544.0ConfirmedBishop of Knin (Tinin), Croatia
11 Jan 175644.1Ordained BishopBishop of Knin (Tinin), Croatia
10 May 177462.4DiedBishop of Knin (Tinin), Croatia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for József Károly Zbiško:
Bishop József Károly Zbiško (born , died ) Bishop of Knin (Tinin)

  • a priest for 40.3 years
  • a bishop for 18.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 408
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1756, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 30 Nov 2015