Catholic-Hierarchy DC

László Pacifik Cardinal Paskai, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Esztergom-Budapest

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Teresa al Corso d’Italia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 May 1927BornSzeged
3 Mar 195123.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
2 Mar 197850.8AppointedApostolic Administrator of Veszprém, Hungary
2 Mar 197850.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Bavagaliana
5 Apr 197850.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bavagaliana
31 Mar 197951.8AppointedBishop of Veszprém, Hungary
5 Apr 198254.9AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Kalocsa, Hungary
3 Mar 198759.8AppointedArchbishop of Esztergom, Hungary
28 Jun 198861.1Elevated to Cardinal
28 Jun 198861.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Teresa al Corso d’Italia
7 Dec 200275.5RetiredArchbishop of Esztergom-Budapest, Hungary
17 Aug 201588.2DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Esztergom-Budapest, Hungary

MicroData Summary for László Pacifik Paskai:
László Pacifik Cardinal Paskai O.F.M. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Esztergom-Budapest

  • a priest for 64.4 years
  • a bishop for 37.3 years
  • a cardinal for 27.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 17 Aug 2015
  • mn: CB, 21 Aug 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 22 Aug 2015