Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ferenc Barkóczy de Szala

Deceased

Archbishop of Esztergom


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Oct 1710BornDobrec
15 Oct 173323.0Ordained PriestPriest
2 Jan 174130.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Tanagra
16 Apr 174130.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tanagra
8 Dec 174434.1SelectedBishop of Eger, Hungary
10 May 174534.5ConfirmedBishop of Eger, Hungary
13 May 176150.5SelectedArchbishop of Esztergom, Hungary
13 Jul 176150.7ConfirmedArchbishop of Esztergom, Hungary
18 Jun 176554.6DiedArchbishop of Esztergom, Hungary

MicroData Summary for Ferenc Barkóczy de Szala:
Archbishop Ferenc Barkóczy de Szala (born , died ) Archbishop of Esztergom

  • a priest for 31.6 years
  • a bishop for 24.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 70, and Page 387
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 391
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1741, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 29 Nov 2015