Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ambróz Lazík

Deceased

Apostolic Administrator of Trnava

Titular Bishop of Appia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Dec 1897BornNádas/Trstin
29 Jun 192224.6Ordained PriestPriest
8 Jun 194749.5AppointedApostolic Administrator of Trnava, Slovakia
25 Jul 194951.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Appia
14 Aug 194951.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Appia
20 Apr 196971.4DiedApostolic Administrator of Trnava, Slovakia

MicroData Summary for Ambróz Lazík:
Bishop Ambróz Lazík (born , died ) Apostolic Administrator of Trnava

  • a priest for 46.8 years
  • a bishop for 19.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1949, Number 66

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013