Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Anton Cardinal Vrancic (Verancsics)

Deceased

Archbishop of Esztergom, Hungary

Note/Previous Titular See: (died before receiving the news of the cardinalate)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 May 1504Born
3 Aug 155450.1AppointedBishop of Pécs, Hungary
17 Jul 156056.1AppointedBishop of Eger, Hungary
21 Sep 156157.3Ordained BishopBishop of Eger, Hungary
25 Sep 157066.3AppointedArchbishop of Esztergom, Hungary
5 Jun 157369.0Elevated to Cardinal
16 Jun 157369.0DiedArchbishop of Esztergom, Hungary

MicroData Summary for Anton Vrancic (Verancsics) (VIAF: 136422)
Anton Cardinal Vrancic (Verancsics) (born , died ) Archbishop of Esztergom

EventPlace
Birth PlaceŠibenik
Ordained PriestPécs, Diocese of Pécs
Ordained BishopFranciscan, Church, Wien, Diocese of Wien, Austria
Death PlacePresov
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Szent Miklós

  • a bishop for 11.7 years
  • a cardinal for -.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 5 Jun 1573
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 280, and Page 98
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 304
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1561, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast