Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Károly Cardinal Hornig

Deceased

Bishop of Veszprém, Hungary

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Agnese fuori le mura


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Aug 1840Born
25 Jul 186221.9Ordained DeaconDeacon
14 Dec 186222.3Ordained PriestPriest
17 Apr 188847.6SelectedBishop of Veszprém, Hungary
1 Jun 188847.8ConfirmedBishop of Veszprém, Hungary
8 Sep 188848.0Ordained BishopBishop of Veszprém, Hungary
2 Dec 191272.3Elevated to Cardinal
28 May 191473.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Agnese fuori le mura
9 Feb 191776.4DiedBishop of Veszprém, Hungary

MicroData Summary for Károly Hornig (VIAF: 5227428)
Károly Cardinal Hornig (born , died ) Bishop of Veszprém

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBuda, Archdiocese of Esztergom
Ordained BishopEsztergom, Archdiocese of Esztergom
Death PlaceVeszprém, Diocese of Veszprém
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Veszprém, Diocese of Veszprém

  • a priest for 54.1 years
  • a bishop for 28.4 years
  • a cardinal for 4.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 588
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1888, Number 48

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 24 May 2017