Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Raffaele Cardinal Monaco La Valletta

Deceased

Prefect of the Congregation of Ceremonies

Cardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

Secretary of the Congregation for Universal Inquisition

Archpriest of the Arcibasilica di San Giovanni in Laterano {Saint John Lateran Basilica}

Major Penitentiary of the Apostolic Penitentiary


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Feb 1827BornAquila
1849²21.8Ordained PriestPriest
13 Mar 186841.0Elevated to Cardinal
16 Mar 186841.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Croce in Gerusalemme
9 Jan 187446.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Heraclea in Europa
12 Jan 187446.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Heraclea in Europa
Mar 1874³47.0ResignedTitular Bishop of Heraclea in Europa
21 Dec 187649.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Roma {Rome}, Italy
27 Feb 188053.0AppointedChamberlain (Camerlengo) of the College of Cardinals
13 May 188154.2ResignedChamberlain (Camerlengo) of the College of Cardinals
12 Feb 188456.9AppointedMajor Penitentiary of the Apostolic Penitentiary
15 Feb 188456.9AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for Universal Inquisition
24 Mar 188457.0AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Albano
4 Mar 188558.0AppointedArchpriest of the Arcibasilica di San Giovanni in Laterano {Saint John Lateran Basilica}
1 Mar 188962.0AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of Ceremonies
24 May 188962.2AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)
14 Jul 189669.3DiedPrefect of the Congregation of Ceremonies

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Raffaele Monaco La Valletta:
Raffaele Cardinal Monaco La Valletta (born , died ) Prefect of Ceremonies

  • a priest for 47.5 years
  • a bishop for 22.5 years
  • a cardinal for 28.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 302, and Page 43
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 44, and Page 48
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 13 Mar 1868

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.1, 18 Dec 2014; Data: 18 Dec 2014