Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis Sebastian Walsh

Deceased

Bishop of Portland, Maine, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jan 1858Born
23 Dec 188224.9Ordained PriestPriest of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
22 Aug 190648.5AppointedBishop of Portland, Maine, USA
18 Oct 190648.7Ordained BishopBishop of Portland, Maine, USA
12 May 192466.3DiedBishop of Portland, Maine, USA

MicroData Summary for Louis Sebastian Walsh
Bishop Louis Sebastian Walsh (born , died ) Bishop of Portland

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSalem, MA

  • a priest for 41.3 years
  • a bishop for 17.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1906, Number 64
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 307

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast