Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pasquale Corrado

Deceased

Bishop of Molfetta-Giovinazzo-Terlizzi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Mar 1835BornMontesarchio
18 Sep 185823.5Ordained PriestPriest
30 Dec 188954.8AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Molfetta-Giovinazzo-Terlizzi, Italy
30 Dec 188954.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Amathus in Palaestina
2 Jan 189054.8SucceededBishop of Molfetta-Giovinazzo-Terlizzi, Italy
5 Jan 189054.8Ordained BishopBishop of Molfetta-Giovinazzo-Terlizzi, Italy
6 Dec 189459.7DiedBishop of Molfetta-Giovinazzo-Terlizzi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pasquale Corrado:
Bishop Pasquale Corrado (born , died ) Bishop of Molfetta-Giovinazzo-Terlizzi

  • a priest for 36.2 years
  • a bishop for 4.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 93, and Page 379

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013