Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Manuel José Caicedo Martínez

Deceased

Archbishop of Medellín


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Nov 1850BornBogota
22 Dec 188333.1Ordained PriestPriest
1 Feb 189241.2AppointedBishop of Pasto, Colombia
29 May 189241.5Ordained BishopBishop of Pasto, Colombia
2 Dec 189545.0AppointedBishop of Popayán, Colombia
14 Dec 190151.1AppointedArchbishop of Popayán, Colombia
14 Dec 190555.1AppointedArchbishop of Medellín, Colombia
12 Aug 190655.7InstalledArchbishop of Medellín, Colombia
22 Jun 193786.6DiedArchbishop of Medellín, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Manuel José Caicedo Martínez:
Archbishop Manuel José Caicedo Martínez (born , died ) Archbishop of Medellín

  • a priest for 53.5 years
  • a bishop for 45.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1937
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 443, and Page 463
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 246

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013