Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Gennaro Cardinal Portanova

Deceased

Archbishop of Reggio Calabria, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of San Clemente


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Oct 1845Born
22 May 186923.6Ordained PriestPriest of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
9 Aug 188337.8AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Ischia, Italy
9 Aug 188337.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Rhosus
12 Aug 188337.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Rhosus
11 Feb 188539.3SucceededBishop of Ischia, Italy
16 Mar 188842.4AppointedArchbishop of Reggio Calabria, Italy
1889²43.2AppointedApostolic Administrator of Bova, Italy
1895²49.2CeasedApostolic Administrator of Bova, Italy
1898²52.2AppointedApostolic Administrator of Oppido Mamertina, Italy
1899²53.2CeasedApostolic Administrator of Oppido Mamertina, Italy
19 Jun 189953.6Elevated to Cardinal
22 Jun 189953.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Clemente
25 Apr 190862.5DiedArchbishop of Reggio Calabria, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gennaro Portanova (VIAF: 90227860)
Gennaro Cardinal Portanova (born , died ) Archbishop of Reggio Calabria

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}
Ordained BishopSsmo. Redentore a Villa Caserta, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceReggio Calabria, Archdiocese of Reggio Calabria
Buried Place (Original)City, Cemetery, Reggio Calabria, Archdiocese of Reggio Calabria
Buried Place (Current)Cathedral, Reggio Calabria, Archdiocese of Reggio Calabria

  • a priest for 38.9 years
  • a bishop for 24.7 years
  • a cardinal for 8.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 325, and Page 480
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 482, and Page 47
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 19 Jun 1899
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1883, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 11 Apr 2017