Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luigi Traversi

Deceased

Bishop of Colle di Val d’Elsa, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Oct 1825Born
2 Jun 184923.6Ordained PriestPriest
27 Mar 188559.4AppointedBishop of Colle di Val d’Elsa, Italy
7 Apr 188559.4Ordained BishopBishop of Colle di Val d’Elsa, Italy
Aug 1891³65.7DiedBishop of Colle di Val d’Elsa, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Luigi Traversi
Bishop Luigi Traversi (born , died Aug 1891) Bishop of Colle di Val d’Elsa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBibbiena
Ordained BishopSt. Jean des Florentins, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 42.1 years
  • a bishop for 6.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 214
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1885, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 14 May 2017