Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Francesco di Paolo Cardinal Satolli

Deceased

Prefect of the Congregation for Studies

Cardinal-Bishop of Frascati

Archpriest of the Arcibasilica di San Giovanni in Laterano {Saint John Lateran Basilica}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jul 1839Born
14 Jun 186222.8Ordained PriestPriest of Perugia, Italy
1 Jun 188848.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Naupactus
1 Jun 188848.8AppointedPresident of the Pontifical Ecclesiastical Academy
10 Jun 188848.8Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Naupactus
1891¹51.4ResignedPresident of the Pontifical Ecclesiastical Academy
24 Jan 189353.5AppointedApostolic Delegate to United States of America
29 Nov 189556.3Elevated to Cardinal
1896¹56.4ResignedApostolic Delegate to United States of America
3 Dec 189657.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Ara Coeli
16 Dec 189657.4AppointedArchpriest of the Arcibasilica di San Giovanni in Laterano {Saint John Lateran Basilica}
21 Jul 189758.0AppointedPrefect of the Congregation for Studies
22 Jun 190363.9AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati
8 Jan 191070.4DiedPrefect of the Congregation for Studies

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco di Paolo Satolli
Francesco di Paolo Cardinal Satolli (born , died ) Prefect of Studies

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMarsciano, Diocese of Perugia, Italy
Ordained PriestPerugia, Diocese of Perugia, Italy
Ordained BishopSt. Alphonse, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Campo Verano, Cemetery, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 47.5 years
  • a bishop for 21.5 years
  • a cardinal for 14.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 404, and Page 46
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 50
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 172, Number 14,394
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 29 Nov 1895
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1888, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 28 May 2017