Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francesco Niola

Deceased

Archbishop of Gaeta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Feb 1842BornAvella
6 Apr 186725.2Ordained PriestPriest
1 Jun 188846.3AppointedBishop of Lacedonia, Italy
10 Jun 188846.3Ordained BishopBishop of Lacedonia, Italy
14 Dec 189149.8AppointedArchbishop of Gaeta, Italy
14 Aug 192078.5DiedArchbishop of Gaeta, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Niola:
Archbishop Francesco Niola (born , died ) Archbishop of Gaeta

  • a priest for 53.4 years
  • a bishop for 32.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1921
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 169, and Page 333

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013