Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Patrick Farrelly

Deceased

Bishop of Cleveland, Ohio, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Mar 1856Born
22 Mar 188024.0Ordained PriestPriest of Nashville, Tennessee, USA
18 Mar 190953.0AppointedBishop of Cleveland, Ohio, USA
1 May 190953.1Ordained BishopBishop of Cleveland, Ohio, USA
12 Feb 192164.9DiedBishop of Cleveland, Ohio, USA

MicroData Summary for John Patrick Farrelly
Bishop John Patrick Farrelly (born , died ) Bishop of Cleveland

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMemphis

  • a priest for 40.8 years
  • a bishop for 11.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1909, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018