Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael Felix Korum

Deceased

Bishop of Trier, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Nov 1840Born
23 Dec 186525.1Ordained PriestPriest of Strasbourg, France
12 Aug 188140.7AppointedBishop of Trier, Germany
14 Aug 188140.7Ordained BishopBishop of Trier, Germany
4 Dec 192181.0DiedBishop of Trier, Germany

MicroData Summary for Michael Felix Korum (VIAF: 22936491)
Bishop Michael Felix Korum (born , died ) Bishop of Trier

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWickerschweiler
Ordained BishopSS. TrinitÓ al Monte Pincio, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 55.9 years
  • a bishop for 40.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 564
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1881, Number 42

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 28 Mar 2017