Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicola Lorusso

Deceased

Bishop of Sant’Angelo dei Lombardi e Bisaccia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jan 1838BornBaren
17 Dec 186427.0Ordained PriestPriest
23 Jun 189052.5AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Sant’Angelo dei Lombardi e Bisaccia, Italy
23 Jun 189052.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Alabanda
29 Jun 189052.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Alabanda
8 Jun 189153.4SucceededBishop of Sant’Angelo dei Lombardi e Bisaccia, Italy
9 Apr 189759.3DiedBishop of Sant’Angelo dei Lombardi e Bisaccia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Nicola Lorusso:
Bishop Nicola Lorusso (born , died ) Bishop of Sant’Angelo dei Lombardi e Bisaccia

  • a priest for 32.3 years
  • a bishop for 6.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 83, and Page 102

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013