Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Apollonio

Deceased

Bishop of Treviso, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Mar 1829Born
20 Sep 185122.5Ordained PriestPriest
12 May 187950.1AppointedBishop of Adria, Italy
22 May 187950.1Ordained BishopBishop of Adria, Italy
25 Sep 188253.5AppointedBishop of Treviso, Italy
12 Nov 190374.6DiedBishop of Treviso, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Apollonio (VIAF: 88645331)
Bishop Giuseppe Apollonio (born , died ) Bishop of Treviso

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVenezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}
Ordained BishopImmaculate Conception, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 52.1 years
  • a bishop for 24.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,901
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 78, and Page 538
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,879, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast