Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Donato Raffaele Cardinal Sbarretti (Tazza)

Deceased

Secretary of the Congregation of the Holy Office

Cardinal-Bishop of Sabina e Poggio Mirteto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Nov 1856Born
12 Apr 187922.4Ordained PriestPriest of Spoleto, Italy
15 Jan 190043.1AppointedBishop of San Cristobal de la Habana, Cuba
4 Feb 190043.2Ordained BishopBishop of San Cristobal de la Habana, Cuba
16 Sep 190144.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Gortyna
16 Sep 190144.8AppointedApostolic Delegate to Philippines
16 Dec 190145.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Ephesus
26 Dec 190246.1AppointedApostolic Delegate to Canada
29 Oct 191053.9AppointedSecretary of the Congregation of the Affairs of Religious
4 Dec 191660.0Elevated to Cardinal
7 Dec 191660.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Silvestro in Capite
28 Mar 191962.3AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of the Council
17 Dec 192872.0AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina e Poggio Mirteto
4 Jul 193073.6AppointedSecretary of the Congregation of the Holy Office
1 Apr 193982.3DiedSecretary of the Congregation of the Holy Office

MicroData Summary for Donato Raffaele Sbarretti (Tazza) (VIAF: 89389488)
Donato Raffaele Cardinal Sbarretti (Tazza) (born , died ) Secretary of Holy Office

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontefranco, Archdiocese of Spoleto, Italy
Ordained PriestRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopWashington, D.C.
Death PlacePalace of the Holy Office, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Cemetery Church, Montefranco, Archdiocese of Spoleto, Italy
Buried Place (Current)Parish, Church, Montefranco, Archdiocese of Spoleto, Italy

  • a priest for 59.9 years
  • a bishop for 39.1 years
  • a cardinal for 22.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 202, and Page 261
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 4 Dec 1916

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast