Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Raffaele Sirolli

Deceased

Secretary of the Congregation of Apostolic Visitation

Titular Archbishop of Iconium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Apr 1841Born
19 Dec 186322.7Ordained PriestPriest
14 Mar 188745.9AppointedBishop of Aquino, Sora, e Pontecorvo, Italy
19 Mar 188745.9Ordained BishopBishop of Aquino, Sora, e Pontecorvo, Italy
14 Dec 189958.6ResignedBishop of Aquino, Sora, e Pontecorvo, Italy
14 Dec 189958.6AppointedSecretary of the Congregation of Apostolic Visitation
14 Dec 189958.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Iconium
20 Apr 190362.0DiedSecretary of the Congregation of Apostolic Visitation

MicroData Summary for Raffaele Sirolli
Archbishop Raffaele Sirolli (born , died ) Secretary of Apostolic Visitation

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopS. Sauveur in Lamo, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 39.3 years
  • a bishop for 16.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 115, and Page 318
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1887, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 25 May 2017