Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Serafino Cardinal Cretoni

Deceased

Prefect of the Congregation of (Sacred) Rites

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria sopra Minerva


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Sep 1833Born
1857²23.3Ordained PriestPriest
11 May 187844.6AppointedPro-Substitute (Sostituto) of the Secretariat of State
19 Sep 187946.0AppointedSubstitute (Sostituto) of the Secretariat of State
16 Nov 188047.1ResignedSubstitute (Sostituto) of the Secretariat of State
16 Jan 189359.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Damascus
5 Feb 189359.4Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Damascus
3 May 189359.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Spain
22 Jun 189662.7Elevated to Cardinal
3 Dec 189663.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria sopra Minerva
23 Oct 190067.1AppointedPrefect of the Congregation for Indulgences and Relics
7 Jan 190369.3AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of (Sacred) Rites
3 Feb 190975.4DiedPrefect of the Congregation of (Sacred) Rites

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Serafino Cretoni (VIAF: 88788173)
Serafino Cardinal Cretoni (born , died ) Prefect of (Sacred) Rites

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSoriano, Diocese of Civita Castellana, Orte e Gallese, Italy
Ordained PriestRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopVia Monteserrat, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Campo Verano, Cemetery, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 52.0 years
  • a bishop for 15.9 years
  • a cardinal for 12.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 238, and Page 50
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 22 Jun 1896
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1893, Number 10
  • xsta/nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 33, and Page 239

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 12 Mar 2018