Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Louis Joseph Napoléon Paul Bruchési

Deceased

Archbishop of Montréal, Québec, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Oct 1855Born
21 Dec 187823.1Ordained PriestPriest of Montréal, Québec, Canada
25 Jun 189741.6AppointedArchbishop of Montréal, Québec, Canada
8 Aug 189741.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Montréal, Québec, Canada
20 Sep 193983.8DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Montréal, Québec, Canada

MicroData Summary for Louis Joseph Napoléon Paul Bruchési (VIAF: 88833111)
Archbishop Louis Joseph Napoléon Paul Bruchési (born , died ) Archbishop of Montréal

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontréal, Diocese of Montréal, Québec
Ordained BishopCathedral, Montréal, Archdiocese of Montréal, Québec
Death PlaceMontréal, Archdiocese of Montréal, Québec

  • a priest for 60.7 years
  • a bishop for 42.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 368
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1897, Number 40

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017