Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lorenzo Antonelli

Deceased

Bishop of Venosa, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jan 1843Born
22 May 186926.3Ordained PriestPriest
1 Jun 189148.3AppointedBishop of Venosa, Italy
7 Jun 189148.3Ordained BishopBishop of Venosa, Italy
13 Jul 190562.4DiedBishop of Venosa, Italy

MicroData Summary for Lorenzo Antonelli (VIAF: 88963001)
Bishop Lorenzo Antonelli (born , died ) Bishop of Venosa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTremonti, Diocese of Marsi
Ordained BishopSt. Alphonse, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 36.1 years
  • a bishop for 14.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 585
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1891, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 25 May 2017