Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Josef Stadler

Deceased

Archbishop of Vrhbosna {Sarajevo}, Bosnia and Herzegovina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jan 1843Born
17 May 186825.3Ordained DeaconDeacon
24 May 186825.3Ordained PriestPriest
29 Sep 188138.6SelectedArchbishop of Vrhbosna {Sarajevo}, Bosnia and Herzegovina
18 Nov 188138.8ConfirmedArchbishop of Vrhbosna {Sarajevo}, Bosnia and Herzegovina
20 Nov 188138.8Ordained BishopArchbishop of Vrhbosna {Sarajevo}, Bosnia and Herzegovina
8 Dec 191875.8DiedArchbishop of Vrhbosna {Sarajevo}, Bosnia and Herzegovina

MicroData Summary for Josef Stadler (VIAF: 64809968)
Archbishop Josef Stadler (born , died ) Archbishop of Vrhbosna {Sarajevo}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSlavonski Brod ad Savum
Ordained BishopSt Clement, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 50.5 years
  • a bishop for 37.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1919
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 596
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,397
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1881, Number 66

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 28 Mar 2017