Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alessio Maria Biffoli, O.S.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Fossombrone


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jan 1828BornRoma
14 Jun 185123.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friar Servants of Mary
24 Mar 188456.2AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Fossombrone, Italy
24 Mar 188456.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Sebaste in Palaestina
6 Apr 188456.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sebaste in Palaestina
13 Apr 188456.2SucceededBishop of Fossombrone, Italy
21 Apr 189264.3DiedBishop of Fossombrone, Italy

MicroData Summary for Alessio Maria Biffoli:
Bishop Alessio Maria Biffoli O.S.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Fossombrone

  • a priest for 40.9 years
  • a bishop for 8.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 275, and Page 496

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013