Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carmelo Ciotola

Deceased

Bishop of Lucera, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Dec 1833Born
19 Dec 185724.0Ordained PriestPriest
14 Dec 189158.0AppointedBishop of Lucera, Italy
20 Dec 189158.0Ordained BishopBishop of Lucera, Italy
Feb 1892³58.1DiedBishop of Lucera, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Carmelo Ciotola
Bishop Carmelo Ciotola (born , died Feb 1892) Bishop of Lucera

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}
Ordained BishopSt. Alphonse, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 34.1 years
  • a bishop for .1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 351
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,891, Number 58

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast