Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luigi Marcello Pellegrini

Deceased

Prelate of Altamura ed Acquaviva delle Fonti

Titular Bishop of Troas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Dec 1825BornScorrano
16 Mar 185024.2Ordained PriestPriest
9 Sep 187953.7AppointedPrelate of Altamura ed Acquaviva delle Fonti, Italy
13 May 188155.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Troas
22 May 188155.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Troas
16 Oct 189468.8DiedPrelate of Altamura ed Acquaviva delle Fonti, Italy

MicroData Summary for Luigi Marcello Pellegrini:
Bishop Luigi Marcello Pellegrini (born , died ) Prelate of Altamura ed Acquaviva delle Fonti

  • a priest for 44.6 years
  • a bishop for 13.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 568

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013