Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of L’Aquila

Archidioecesis Aquilanus



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Giuseppe Petrocchi, Archbishop
  • Giuseppe Molinari, Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of L’Aquila
20 February 1257ErectedDiocese of L’Aquila (erected)
1818Territory AddedDiocese of Città Ducale (suppressed) Diocese of L’Aquila
Archdiocese of L’Aquila
19 January 1876ElevatedDiocese of L’Aquila Archdiocese of L’Aquila
15 August 1972ElevatedArchdiocese of L’Aquila (became a Metropolitan)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of L’Aquila
1950115,000115,000100.0%15372225511139335145ap1951
197096,95997,62599.3%10181182532114454148ap1971
198096,60098,70097.9%757014566683311147ap1981
1990100,000105,50094.8%745613076968273146ap1991
1999100,000105,50094.8%903412480648287147ap2000
2000105,000107,22097.9%1023413677248287147ap2001
2001105,000107,22097.9%1083414273948287147ap2002
2002105,000107,22097.9%11734151695248287147ap2003
2003106,000108,30097.9%11734151701248287147ap2004
2004106,000108,30097.9%12134155683248287147ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 12 Aug 2014