Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Podaliri

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Recanati e Loreto, Italy

Titular Bishop of Derbe


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Aug 1819Born
21 Sep 184425.0Ordained PriestPriest of Recanati e Loreto, Italy
23 Jun 189070.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Recanati e Loreto, Italy
23 Jun 189070.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Derbe
29 Jun 189070.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Derbe
10 Nov 191091.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Recanati e Loreto, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pietro Podaliri
Bishop Pietro Podaliri (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Recanati e Loreto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRecanati, Diocese of Recanati e Loreto
Ordained BishopSt. Alphonse, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 66.1 years
  • a bishop for 20.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 242
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1890, Number 43

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 Jun 2017