Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Enrico Cardinal Enríquez

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Eusebio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Sep 1701BornCampi, Italy
15 Dec 174342.2Ordained DeaconDeacon
16 Dec 174342.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nazianzus
29 Dec 174342.2Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Nazianzus
23 Jan 174442.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Spain
26 Nov 175352.1Elevated to Cardinal
3 May 175452.5ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Spain
22 Jul 175452.8InstalledCardinal-Priest of Sant’Eusebio
25 Apr 175654.5DiedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Eusebio

MicroData Summary for Enrico Enríquez (VIAF: 51762464)
Enrico Cardinal Enríquez (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Eusebio

  • a bishop for 12.3 years
  • a cardinal for 2.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 26 Nov 1753
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1743, Number 46
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Karttunen), Page 243

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 7 Nov 2016