Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Henry Norton

Deceased

Bishop of Port Augusta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Dec 1855BornBallarat
8 Apr 188226.3Ordained PriestPriest of Adelaide, Australia
18 Aug 190650.6AppointedBishop of Port Augusta, Australia
9 Dec 190650.9Ordained BishopBishop of Port Augusta, Australia
22 Mar 192367.2DiedBishop of Port Augusta, Australia

MicroData Summary for John Henry Norton:
Bishop John Henry Norton (born , died ) Bishop of Port Augusta

  • a priest for 41.0 years
  • a bishop for 16.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1906, Number 79

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013