Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Francesco Cardinal Battaglini

Deceased

Archbishop of Bologna

Cardinal-Priest of San Bernardo alle Terme


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Mar 1823BornSant'Agostino di Piano
20 Sep 184522.5Ordained PriestPriest of Bologna, Italy
28 Feb 187956.0AppointedBishop of Rimini, Italy
9 Mar 187956.0Ordained BishopBishop of Rimini, Italy
3 Jul 188259.3AppointedArchbishop of Bologna, Italy
27 Jul 188562.4Elevated to Cardinal
30 Jul 188562.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Bernardo alle Terme
8 Jul 189269.3DiedArchbishop of Bologna, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Battaglini:
Cardinal Francesco Battaglini (born , died ) Archbishop of Bologna

  • a priest for 46.8 years
  • a bishop for 13.3 years
  • a cardinal for 6.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 122, and Page 153
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 47
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 27 Jul 1885

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013