Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francisco Plancarte y Navarrette

Deceased

Archbishop of Linares o Nueva León, Nuevo León


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Oct 1856BornZamora
18 Dec 188024.2Ordained PriestPriest
17 Sep 189538.9AppointedBishop of Campeche, México
16 Feb 189639.3Ordained BishopBishop of Campeche, México
26 Nov 189640.1InstalledBishop of Campeche, México
28 Nov 189842.1AppointedBishop of Cuernavaca, Morelos, México
16 Feb 189942.3InstalledBishop of Cuernavaca, Morelos, México
27 Nov 191155.1AppointedArchbishop of Linares o Nueva León, Nuevo León, México
3 May 191255.5InstalledArchbishop of Linares o Nueva León, Nuevo León, México
2 Jul 192063.7DiedArchbishop of Linares o Nueva León, Nuevo León, México

MicroData Summary for Francisco Plancarte y Navarrette:
Archbishop Francisco Plancarte y Navarrette (born , died ) Archbishop of Linares o Nueva León

  • a priest for 39.5 years
  • a bishop for 24.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 176, and Page 233

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013