Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Pistocchi

Deceased

Bishop of Cassano all’Jonio, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Mar 1824Born
19 Dec 184622.7Ordained PriestPriest
27 Feb 188055.9AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of San Marco e Bisignano, Italy
27 Feb 188055.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Sinopoli
7 Mar 188056.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sinopoli
24 Mar 188460.0AppointedBishop of Cassano all’Jonio, Italy
29 Aug 188864.4DiedBishop of Cassano all’Jonio, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio Pistocchi
Bishop Antonio Pistocchi (born , died ) Bishop of Cassano all’Jonio

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCerchiara, Diocese of Cassano all’Jonio
Ordained BishopSan Alfonso all’Esquilino, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 41.6 years
  • a bishop for 8.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 188, and Page 365
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 520
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1880, Number 10
  • c34: CB, 14 Jun 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 16 Jun 2018

Quantcast