Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giuseppe Maria Costantini (Constantini)

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Nepi e Sutri, Italy

Titular Archbishop of Patrae (Veters)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Mar 1834Born
22 Mar 185622.0Ordained DeaconDeacon
20 Sep 185622.5Ordained PriestPriest
Jan 1878³43.8AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Nepi e Sutri, Italy
Jan 1878³43.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Nyssa
15 Jul 187844.3SucceededBishop of Nepi e Sutri, Italy
21 Jul 187844.3Ordained BishopBishop of Nepi e Sutri, Italy
1 Jun 189157.2ResignedBishop of Nepi e Sutri, Italy
1 Jun 189157.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Patrae (Veters)
14 Nov 190672.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Nepi e Sutri, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Maria Costantini (Constantini) (VIAF: 233347769)
Archbishop Giuseppe Maria Costantini (Constantini) (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Nepi e Sutri

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAcquapendente, Diocese of Acquapendente
Ordained BishopS. Apollinare, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 50.1 years
  • a bishop for 28.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 409, and Page 444
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1878, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 19 Jun 2017