Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop St. Giuseppe Marello, O.S.I. †

Deceased

Bishop of Acqui, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Dec 1844Born
6 Jun 186823.4Ordained DeaconDeacon of Asti, Italy
19 Sep 186823.7Ordained PriestPriest of Asti, Italy
11 Feb 188944.1AppointedBishop of Acqui, Italy
17 Feb 188944.1Ordained BishopBishop of Acqui, Italy
30 May 189550.4DiedBishop of Acqui, Italy
26 Sep 1993Beatified
25 Nov 2001Canonized

MicroData Summary for St. Giuseppe Marello (VIAF: 8198956)
Bishop St. Giuseppe Marello O.S.I. (born , died ) Bishop of Acqui

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTurin, Archdiocese of Torino {Turin}
Ordained BishopImmaculate Conception, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 26.6 years
  • a bishop for 6.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 114
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1889, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 May 2017