Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Morticelli

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Penne e Atri, Italy

Titular Bishop of Caesarea Philippi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jan 1834Born
20 Mar 185824.2Ordained PriestPriest
23 Jun 189056.4AppointedBishop of Penne e Atri, Italy
29 Jun 189056.4Ordained BishopBishop of Penne e Atri, Italy
Feb 1905³71.0ResignedBishop of Penne e Atri, Italy
11 Dec 190571.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Caesarea Philippi
11 Oct 191076.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Penne e Atri, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Morticelli (VIAF: 89328448)
Bishop Giuseppe Morticelli (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Penne e Atri

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSulmona, Diocese of Valva e Sulmona
Ordained BishopSt. Alphonse, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 52.5 years
  • a bishop for 20.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 446
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 98
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1890, Number 40

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 24 May 2017