Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Maria Sardi

Deceased

Bishop of Pinerolo, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Dec 1825Born
18 Dec 184722.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Pinerolo, Italy
17 Jun 184822.5Ordained PriestPriest of Pinerolo, Italy
7 Jun 188660.5AppointedBishop of Pinerolo, Italy
13 Jun 188660.5Ordained BishopBishop of Pinerolo, Italy
22 Jan 189468.1DiedBishop of Pinerolo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Maria Sardi
Bishop Giovanni Maria Sardi (born , died ) Bishop of Pinerolo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRocchetta Tanaro, Diocese of Pinerolo
Ordained BishopSt. Alphonse, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 45.5 years
  • a bishop for 7.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 455
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1886, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 May 2017