Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francesco d’Albore

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Monopoli, Italy

Titular Archbishop of Pompeiopolis in Paphlagonia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jun 1828Born
14 Jun 185122.9Ordained DeaconDeacon
5 Jun 185223.9Ordained PriestPriest
7 Jun 188657.9AppointedBishop of Monopoli, Italy
13 Jun 188657.9Ordained BishopBishop of Monopoli, Italy
4 Sep 190173.2ResignedBishop of Monopoli, Italy
4 Sep 190173.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Pompeiopolis in Paphlagonia
25 Dec 192092.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Monopoli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco d’Albore
Archbishop Francesco d’Albore (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Monopoli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCasapulla, Archdiocese of Capua
Ordained BishopSt. Alphonse, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 68.5 years
  • a bishop for 34.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 392, and Page 462
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1886, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 May 2017