Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michele de Jorio

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Castellammare di Stabia, Italy

Titular Bishop of DorylaŽum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Oct 1845Born
14 Nov 186924.0Ordained PriestPriest
25 Nov 188742.1AppointedBishop of Bovino, Italy
8 Dec 188742.1Ordained BishopBishop of Bovino, Italy
4 Feb 189852.3AppointedBishop of Castellammare di Stabia, Italy
1 Dec 192176.1ResignedBishop of Castellammare di Stabia, Italy
1 Dec 192176.1AppointedTitular Bishop of DorylaŽum
4 Apr 192276.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Castellammare di Stabia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Michele de Jorio (VIAF: 88895487)
Bishop Michele de Jorio (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Castellammare di Stabia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceColli al Volturno
Ordained BishopSte Agnes-Place Novane, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 52.3 years
  • a bishop for 34.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1921
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1923
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 155, and Page 191
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1887, Number 67

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 May 2017