Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Luigi (Domenico Daniele) Cardinal Sepiacci, O.E.S.A. †

Deceased

Prefect of the Congregation for Indulgences and Relics

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Prisca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Sep 1835Born
28 Jun 185216.7ProfessedMember of Order of Hermits of St. Augustine
29 May 185822.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Hermits of St. Augustine
15 Mar 188347.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Callinicum
18 Mar 188347.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Callinicum
7 Aug 188549.9AppointedPresident of the Pontifical Ecclesiastical Academy
2 Jul 188650.8AppointedSecretary of the Congregation of Bishops and Regulars
14 Dec 189156.2Elevated to Cardinal
17 Dec 189156.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prisca
1 Aug 189256.8AppointedPrefect of the Congregation for Indulgences and Relics
26 Apr 189357.6DiedPrefect of the Congregation for Indulgences and Relics

MicroData Summary for Luigi (Domenico Daniele) Sepiacci (VIAF: 89433873)
Luigi (Domenico Daniele) Cardinal Sepiacci O.E.S.A. (born , died ) Prefect of Indulgences and Relics

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastiglione del Lago, Diocese of Perugia, Italy
Ordained PriestPerugia, Diocese of Perugia, Italy
Ordained BishopS. Augustin, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)O.E.S.A. Chapel, Campo Verano, Cemetery, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Current)S. Prisca, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 34.9 years
  • a bishop for 10.1 years
  • a cardinal for 1.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 173, and Page 52
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 14 Dec 1891
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1883, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 25 May 2017